TN HB1979 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 72
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 72
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, reduces from three to two the number of consecutive years a utility district, water system, or wastewater facility must have a negative change in net assets in order to be considered financially distressed. - Amends TCA Section 7-82-703; Section 7-82-401 and Section 68-221-1010.
Title
As enacted, reduces from three to two the number of consecutive years a utility district, water system, or wastewater facility must have a negative change in net assets in order to be considered financially distressed. - Amends TCA Section 7-82-703; Section 7-82-401 and Section 68-221-1010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 72 | |
2009-04-06 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/6/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/02/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Action Def. in State & Local Government Committee to 3/31/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/18/2009 | |
2009-03-09 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2009-03-02 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2049 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-22 - Pub. Ch. 72
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1979&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1979.pdf |