TN HB1957 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 916
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 916
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the date for repeal of a current law specifying certain law enforcement body camera video must be treated as confidential and not subject to public inspection from July 1, 2022, until July 1, 2027; revises provision in regard to the confidentiality of body camera video that depicts minors within a school that serves grades K-12 to include as confidential such video that depicts minors in a child care agency, child care program, preschool, or nursery school. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7 and Title 38.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7 and Title 38, relative to law enforcement body camera video.
Sponsors
Rep. John Gillespie [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 916 | |
2022-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2022 |
2022-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2022-02-28 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2022-01-27 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-01-26 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2061 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/27/2022