TN SB2061 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/27/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/27/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the date for repeal of a current law specifying certain law enforcement body camera video must be treated as confidential and not subject to public inspection from July 1, 2022, until July 1, 2027; revises provision in regard to the confidentiality of body camera video that depicts minors within a school that serves grades K-12 to include as confidential such video that depicts minors in a child care agency, child care program, preschool, or nursery school. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7 and Title 38.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7 and Title 38, relative to law enforcement body camera video.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective date(s) 04/27/2022 | |
2022-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 916 | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-11 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0827) |
2022-04-11 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0870) |
2022-04-11 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-10 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0550) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/7/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1957 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 916