TN HB1956 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date(s) 03/28/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date(s) 03/28/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases the number of EMT/AEMT training centers operated by ambulance services that may be operated from 15 to 30; authorizes EMT/AEMT training centers to provide online or virtual didactic instruction to the same extent such instruction may be provided by accredited EMS education institutions; makes other related changes; urges ambulance services operating EMT/AEMT training centers and the Tennessee board of regents to develop partnerships as practicable to increase the capacity of this state to prepare EMTs, AEMTs, and paramedics. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, relative to ground ambulance service providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Effective date(s) 03/28/2022 | |
2022-03-30 | Pub. Ch. 684 | |
2022-03-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-03-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-16 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-14 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 93, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB1956 |
2022-03-10 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0562) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/28/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/24/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/8/2022 |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1908 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 684