TN HB1953 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the AOC to issue registration numbers to any person seeking to serve process for the courts of this state who is not less than eighteen years of age; requires a registration number to be included on the return for any process served. - Amends TCA Title 20.
Title
As introduced, requires the AOC to issue registration numbers to any person seeking to serve process for the courts of this state who is not less than eighteen years of age; requires a registration number to be included on the return for any process served. - Amends TCA Title 20.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2014-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee--Government Operations for review |
2014-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2152 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-29 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1953&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1953.pdf |