TN HB1952 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 911
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 911
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes governing bodies to exclude from taxable value of property appearing on the assessment roll, the taxable value of properties subject to tax increment financing and properties within areas where an economic impact plan has been approved. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As enacted, authorizes governing bodies to exclude from taxable value of property appearing on the assessment roll, the taxable value of properties subject to tax increment financing and properties within areas where an economic impact plan has been approved. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 911 | |
2018-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to Next Calendar |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1923 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 911