TN SB1923 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 911
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 911
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes governing bodies to exclude from taxable value of property appearing on the assessment roll, the taxable value of properties subject to tax increment financing and properties within areas where an economic impact plan has been approved. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As enacted, authorizes governing bodies to exclude from taxable value of property appearing on the assessment roll, the taxable value of properties subject to tax increment financing and properties within areas where an economic impact plan has been approved. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 911 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 05/01/2018 | |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1952 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 911