TN HB1939 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows county commissioner in the actual discharge of the commissioner's duties who has a valid handgun carry permit to carry in buildings in which county commission meetings are held, but not in room in which judicial proceeding in progress; not applicable to member of legislative body of metropolitan government. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As enacted, allows county commissioner in the actual discharge of the commissioner's duties who has a valid handgun carry permit to carry in buildings in which county commission meetings are held, but not in room in which judicial proceeding in progress; not applicable to member of legislative body of metropolitan government. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 880 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 1 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-02 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 71, Nays 17, PNV 2 |
2018-04-02 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1051) |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-26 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1500 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 880