TN HB1888 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires at least one driver license testing station that conducts commercial driver license (CDL) tests to be located in each grand division of the state. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
As introduced, requires at least one driver license testing station that conducts commercial driver license (CDL) tests to be located in each grand division of the state. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Safety & Funding Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2026 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee