TN HB1847 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires political communications through a social media platform to indicate the person, candidate, or political committee who paid for and, as applicable, authorized the communication. - Amends TCA Section 2-19-120.
Title
As introduced, requires political communications through a social media platform to indicate the person, candidate, or political committee who paid for and, as applicable, authorized the communication. - Amends TCA Section 2-19-120.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/16/2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2018-03-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-12 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-24 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1635 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-16 - Failed to pass H., Ayes 43, Nays 33, PNV 14