TN HB1829 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 602
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 602
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds a representative of the alcoholic beverage commission to the human trafficking advisory council. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 30 and Title 57, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, adds a representative of the alcoholic beverage commission to the human trafficking advisory council. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 30 and Title 57, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Dave Wright [R] |
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Sen. London Lamar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 602 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-03-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1731 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 602