TN HB1795 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 593
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 593
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds community mental health centers to definition of healthcare organization in order to add them to quality improvement committees. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, adds community mental health centers to definition of healthcare organization in order to add them to quality improvement committees. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
Rep. Rick Staples [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 593 | |
2018-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-08 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1718 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 593