TN HB1770 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Health Care Freedom and Affordable Care Noncompliance Act", which prohibits state entities from establishing or administering any regulatory scheme to operate the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Health Care Freedom and Affordable Care Noncompliance Act", which prohibits state entities from establishing or administering any regulatory scheme to operate the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/19/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 2/19/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/5/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2014-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1888 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-24 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1770&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1770.pdf |