TN SB1888 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Health Care Freedom and Affordable Care Noncompliance Act", which prohibits state entities from establishing or administering any regulatory scheme to operate the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Health Care Freedom and Affordable Care Noncompliance Act", which prohibits state entities from establishing or administering any regulatory scheme to operate the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-24SenateAssigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
2014-03-20SenateAction Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/24/2014
2014-03-19SenatePlaced on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/20/2014
2014-03-18SenatePlaced on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014
2014-03-18SenateAction Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/20/2014
2014-03-12SenatePlaced on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014
2014-03-11SenateAction Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/18/2014
2014-03-05SenatePlaced on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014
2014-03-04SenateAction Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/11/2014
2014-02-26SenatePlaced on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014
2014-02-18SenateAction Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/4/2014
2014-02-12SenatePlaced on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 2/18/2014
2014-02-04SenateAction Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 2/11/2014
2014-01-29SenatePlaced on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 2/4/2014
2014-01-27SenateP2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
2014-01-23SenateIntro., P1C.
2014-01-21SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1770 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback