TN HB1693 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 562
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes ex officio members of the Tennessee commission for the United States semiquincentennial commission to appoint designees to serve on the commission; transfers the administrative attachment for the commission from the department of tourist development to the Tennessee State Museum. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 44.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 44, relative to the Tennessee Commission for the United States Semiquicentennial Commission Act.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Rep. Greg Vital [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 562 | |
2024-02-26 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-02-22 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/14/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-02-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/7/2024 |
2024-01-31 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 1/31/2024 |
2024-01-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2024-01-10 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2092 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 03/12/2024