TN HB1690 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, restricts ability to sell, purchase, or possess products containing intoxicating cannabinoids derived from hemp to persons who are 21 years of age or older; requires retailers and wholesalers of products containing hemp-derived cannabinoids to be licensed; levies privilege tax at rate of 6.6 percent on wholesale sale of products containing hemp-derived cannabinoids. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 15; Title 43, Chapter 27 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 15; Title 43, Chapter 27 and Title 67, relative to products containing cannabinoids.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] | Sen. London Lamar [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - HOUSE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action def. in Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-01 | House | No Action Taken |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2022-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1767 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee