TN HB1674 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes from TCA a report on the title pledge business due from the commissioner of financial institutions on February 1, 2006. - Amends TCA Title 45.
Title
As introduced, removes from TCA a report on the title pledge business due from the commissioner of financial institutions on February 1, 2006. - Amends TCA Title 45.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-18 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1748 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee