TN HB1674 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends provision whereby, subject to the employer's discretion, an employee who serves food or beverages to customers may waive the employee's right to a 30 minute unpaid meal break to make the provision applicable to all employees. - Amends TCA Section 50-2-103.
Title
As introduced, extends provision whereby, subject to the employer's discretion, an employee who serves food or beverages to customers may waive the employee's right to a 30 minute unpaid meal break to make the provision applicable to all employees. - Amends TCA Section 50-2-103.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/19/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 2/19/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 2/12/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee |
2014-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-17 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1743 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C& L Comm
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1674&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1674.pdf |