TN HB1594 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the offense of female genital mutilation; creates a civil cause of action for victims of female genital mutilation; expands the offenses of child abuse and endangerment to include female genital mutilation. - Amends TCA Section 28-3-104; Title 29, Chapter 34, Part 2; Title 36; Section 39-11-703; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 4 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, expands the offense of female genital mutilation; creates a civil cause of action for victims of female genital mutilation; expands the offenses of child abuse and endangerment to include female genital mutilation. - Amends TCA Section 28-3-104; Title 29, Chapter 34, Part 2; Title 36; Section 39-11-703; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1; Title 39, Chapter 15, Part 4 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-17 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2533 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee