TN HB1576 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Veterans' Bill of Rights" to help military veterans access jobs, college degrees, health care, and housing. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 50; Title 55, Chapter 50; Title 58, Chapter 3; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 50; Title 55, Chapter 50; Title 58, Chapter 3; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to military veterans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-23HouseAction Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/30/2021
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
2021-03-01HouseAssigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
2021-03-01HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2021-02-25HouseP1C.
2021-02-24HouseIntro.
2021-02-24HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0817 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback