TN SB0817 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Veterans' Bill of Rights" to help military veterans access jobs, college degrees, health care, and housing. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 50; Title 55, Chapter 50; Title 58, Chapter 3; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33; Title 50; Title 55, Chapter 50; Title 58, Chapter 3; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to military veterans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/14/2021
2021-04-13SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/14/2021
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-04-06SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/13/2021
2021-04-05SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1576 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback