TN HB1536 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that the textbooks and instructional materials adopted by the state board of education be available online for public inspection; authorizes the public to continue to provide public comment on the textbooks and instructional materials after the adoption process. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 22.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 22, relative to textbooks and instructional materials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2021-03-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-25 | House | P1C. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro. |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0593 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee