TN SB0593 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that the textbooks and instructional materials adopted by the state board of education be available online for public inspection; authorizes the public to continue to provide public comment on the textbooks and instructional materials after the adoption process. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 22.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 22, relative to textbooks and instructional materials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1536 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction