TN HB1532 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces the department of revenue's administration fee of 1.125 percent imposed on local governments for remittance of local option sales tax by 0.375 percent annually for the next three fiscal years. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, reduces the department of revenue's administration fee of 1.125 percent imposed on local governments for remittance of local option sales tax by 0.375 percent annually for the next three fiscal years. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Eddie Smith [R] | Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Roger Kane [R] |
Rep. Harry Brooks [R] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/7/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-01-17 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1687 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee