TN HB1462 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-23 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-23 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each law enforcement agency to develop a policy by July 1, 2023, on the use of force that emphasizes the use of force only as a reasonable and proportional response when viewed in light of the crime a suspect is alleged to have committed. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38 and Title 39, relative to law enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 1/23/2024 |
2023-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2024 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1199 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2024