TN HB1452 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-16 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of agriculture to include information on sustainable and organic farming techniques in information disseminated by the commissioner relative to winemaking. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to alcohol.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Potts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0967 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee