TN HB1438 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 183
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 183
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the Tennessee automobile insurance plan; requires all insurance companies licensed to write direct automobile liability policies in this state to be members of the plan. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 12, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, creates the Tennessee automobile insurance plan; requires all insurance companies licensed to write direct automobile liability policies in this state to be members of the plan. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 12, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Pub. Ch. 183 | |
2009-05-21 | Effective date(s) 05/07/09; 01/01/10 | |
2009-05-07 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-04-29 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-04-29 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-04-29 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-04-28 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-04-27 | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-23 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/27/09 | |
2009-04-20 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-20 | S. adopted am. 1 | |
2009-04-20 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-03-26 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-03-23 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-03-23 | Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0 | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/23/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 03/17/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 03/10/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 03/04/2009 | |
2009-03-02 | Assigned to s/c Industrial Impact of COM | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on s/c cal Utilities & Banking of COM for 03/03/2009 | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to s/c Utilities & Banking of COM | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to Commerce | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1180 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 183