TN HB1389 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Re-ref. Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Re-ref. Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, eliminates requirement that joint ventures of the Cookeville Regional Medical Center Authority be located on city-owned property; permits joint ownership arrangements of the CRMC if approved by majority vote of the Cookeville City Council. - Amends Chapter 223 of the Private Acts of 1961; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, eliminates requirement that joint ventures of the Cookeville Regional Medical Center Authority be located on city-owned property; permits joint ownership arrangements of the CRMC if approved by majority vote of the Cookeville City Council. - Amends Chapter 223 of the Private Acts of 1961; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 1 BY Sexton C. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | House | Re-ref. Local Government Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/20/2015 |
2015-03-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-03-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1417 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill.