TN SB1417 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, eliminates requirement that joint ventures of the Cookeville Regional Medical Center Authority be located on city-owned property; permits joint ownership arrangements of the CRMC if approved by majority vote of the Cookeville City Council. - Amends Chapter 223 of the Private Acts of 1961; as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, eliminates requirement that joint ventures of the Cookeville Regional Medical Center Authority be located on city-owned property; permits joint ownership arrangements of the CRMC if approved by majority vote of the Cookeville City Council. - Amends Chapter 223 of the Private Acts of 1961; as amended.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1389 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-22 - Re-ref. Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1417&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1417.pdf |