TN HB1344 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 867
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 867
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, if the county election commission has arranged for the use of a public school or a public charter school as a polling place for a regular November election, that the LEA or the public charter school be closed for instruction on the election day; authorizes an LEA or public charter school to choose to be open or closed for instruction on election days other than days on which a regular November election occurs. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 6 and Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires, if the county election commission has arranged for the use of a public school or a public charter school as a polling place for a regular November election, that the LEA or the public charter school be closed for instruction on the election day; authorizes an LEA or public charter school to choose to be open or closed for instruction on election days other than days on which a regular November election occurs. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 6 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 867 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2019 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 3 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/18/18 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/17/18 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0969) |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-02 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1034) |
2018-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2018-03-07 | House | Sponsor change. |
2018-01-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 1/17/2018 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 1st Calendar of 2018 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1399 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 867