TN SB1399 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 867
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 867
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, if the county election commission has arranged for the use of a public school or a public charter school as a polling place for a regular November election, that the LEA or the public charter school be closed for instruction on the election day; authorizes an LEA or public charter school to choose to be open or closed for instruction on election days other than days on which a regular November election occurs. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 6 and Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires, if the county election commission has arranged for the use of a public school or a public charter school as a polling place for a regular November election, that the LEA or the public charter school be closed for instruction on the election day; authorizes an LEA or public charter school to choose to be open or closed for instruction on election days other than days on which a regular November election occurs. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 6 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 867 | |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1344 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 867