TN HB1338 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 411
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 411
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the provision regarding the sale of alcoholic beverages in certain unincorporated areas. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As enacted, revises the provision regarding the sale of alcoholic beverages in certain unincorporated areas. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State & Local Government Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State & Local Government Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 411 | |
2011-05-20 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-05-18 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/16/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-02 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-04-26 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0730 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-10 - Pub. Ch. 411