TN HB1268 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases from 10 to 12 days the deadline for requesting a formal hearing before the commissioner on adverse action proposed or taken to implement any revenue regulatory or registration law administered by the commissioner, not including those laws relating to assessments or levies of taxes, fees, fines, penalties, interest, or the waiver of penalties. - Amends TCA Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases from 10 to 12 days the deadline for requesting a formal hearing before the commissioner on adverse action proposed or taken to implement any revenue regulatory or registration law administered by the commissioner, not including those laws relating to assessments or levies of taxes, fees, fines, penalties, interest, or the waiver of penalties. - Amends TCA Title 67.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced behind the budget
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-18HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-18HouseRef. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0721 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback