TN SB0721 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 10 to 12 days the deadline for requesting a formal hearing before the commissioner on adverse action proposed or taken to implement any revenue regulatory or registration law administered by the commissioner, not including those laws relating to assessments or levies of taxes, fees, fines, penalties, interest, or the waiver of penalties. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, increases from 10 to 12 days the deadline for requesting a formal hearing before the commissioner on adverse action proposed or taken to implement any revenue regulatory or registration law administered by the commissioner, not including those laws relating to assessments or levies of taxes, fees, fines, penalties, interest, or the waiver of penalties. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1268 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019