TN HB1252 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, states that there is no cause of action for wrongful birth based on a claim that a person would not or should not have been born or for wrongful life based on a claim that a person would or should have been aborted. - Amends TCA Title 20 and Title 29.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 20 and Title 29, relative to torts.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] |
Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Mark Hall [R] |
Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 379 | |
2021-04-29 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-22 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-03-10 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1370 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021