TN SB1370 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, states that there is no cause of action for wrongful birth based on a claim that a person would not or should not have been born or for wrongful life based on a claim that a person would or should have been aborted. - Amends TCA Title 20 and Title 29.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 20 and Title 29, relative to torts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 379 | |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 69, Nays 20, PNV 0 |
2021-04-29 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 6 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1252 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 379