TN HB1230 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that a deed for the conveyance of real property be prepared and filed by a licensed attorney or the owner of the property; requires the county register to verify a deed is properly prepared before it is registered and to note the verification on the deed. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 13; Title 23, Chapter 3; Title 66, Chapter 5, Part 1 and Title 66, Chapter 24.
Title
As introduced, requires that a deed for the conveyance of real property be prepared and filed by a licensed attorney or the owner of the property; requires the county register to verify a deed is properly prepared before it is registered and to note the verification on the deed. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 13; Title 23, Chapter 3; Title 66, Chapter 5, Part 1 and Title 66, Chapter 24.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Held on desk. |
2017-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-20 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2017-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1311 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee