TN HB1206 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes the current autism spectrum disorder task force and replaces it with the Tennessee council on autism spectrum disorder. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, deletes the current autism spectrum disorder task force and replaces it with the Tennessee council on autism spectrum disorder. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Charles Sargent [R] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
Rep. JoAnne Favors [D] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/9/2016 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1390 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1206&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1206.pdf |