TN SB1390 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes the current autism spectrum disorder task force and replaces it with the Tennessee council on autism spectrum disorder. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, deletes the current autism spectrum disorder task force and replaces it with the Tennessee council on autism spectrum disorder. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/12/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2016 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to 3/2/2106 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/10/2016 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Government Operations Committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/25/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1206 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee