TN HB1088 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes requirement that spouses of persons serving in the armed forces of the United States be actively employed in a profession when moving to this state in order to have their application for licensure expedited. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 13 and Title 68, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, deletes requirement that spouses of persons serving in the armed forces of the United States be actively employed in a profession when moving to this state in order to have their application for licensure expedited. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 13 and Title 68, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1327 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee