TN HB1045 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, imposes a moratorium on the use of public or private land for the above ground disposal of human remains for the purpose of studying the decomposition of the human body; grandfathers in certain facilities currently involved in the above ground study of human remains. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 11, Chapter 6; Title 46; Title 49; Title 62, Chapter 5 and Title 68, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, imposes a moratorium on the use of public or private land for the above ground disposal of human remains for the purpose of studying the decomposition of the human body; grandfathers in certain facilities currently involved in the above ground study of human remains. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 11, Chapter 6; Title 46; Title 49; Title 62, Chapter 5 and Title 68, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/13/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2013-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2013-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1187 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-03 - Failed In S. Jud Comm. Ayes 3, Nays 3 PNV 2
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1045&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1045.pdf |