TN HB1044 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, specifies that, with regard to premium rates for health benefit plans subject to the Tennessee Small Employer Group Health Coverage Reform Act, self-insurer pools consisting of two or more member employers of the same trade or professional organization with at least 500 covered lives are not prohibited from using case characteristics, claim experience, health status, or duration of coverage since issue in determining initial or adjusted premium rates for employers pooling their liabilities. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 62 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, specifies that, with regard to premium rates for health benefit plans subject to the Tennessee Small Employer Group Health Coverage Reform Act, self-insurer pools consisting of two or more member employers of the same trade or professional organization with at least 500 covered lives are not prohibited from using case characteristics, claim experience, health status, or duration of coverage since issue in determining initial or adjusted premium rates for employers pooling their liabilities. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 62 and Title 63.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 182
2019-04-11HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAssigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseRef. to Insurance Committee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0942 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 182

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback