TN SB0942 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, specifies that, with regard to premium rates for health benefit plans subject to the Tennessee Small Employer Group Health Coverage Reform Act, self-insurer pools consisting of two or more member employers of the same trade or professional organization with at least 500 covered lives are not prohibited from using case characteristics, claim experience, health status, or duration of coverage since issue in determining initial or adjusted premium rates for employers pooling their liabilities. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 62 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, specifies that, with regard to premium rates for health benefit plans subject to the Tennessee Small Employer Group Health Coverage Reform Act, self-insurer pools consisting of two or more member employers of the same trade or professional organization with at least 500 covered lives are not prohibited from using case characteristics, claim experience, health status, or duration of coverage since issue in determining initial or adjusted premium rates for employers pooling their liabilities. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 62 and Title 63.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01 Pub. Ch. 182
2019-05-01 Effective date(s) 04/23/2019
2019-04-23SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-16SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-15HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-15SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-12SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-11HousePassed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-11HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0232)
2019-04-11HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-10HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-09SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-08SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-04-08SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0240)
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2019
2019-04-02SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1044 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 182

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback