TN HB1017 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes obsolete language that prohibited revenue from being apportioned pursuant to an allocation made in a specific dollar amount in the general appropriations act to the county revenue partnership fund in fiscal years 2007-2008 and 2008-2009. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5 and Title 67, relative to distribution of sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1585 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee