TN SB1585 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes obsolete language that prohibited revenue from being apportioned pursuant to an allocation made in a specific dollar amount in the general appropriations act to the county revenue partnership fund in fiscal years 2007-2008 and 2008-2009. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5 and Title 67, relative to distribution of sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1017 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee