TN HB1003 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows a party or non-party making certain filings with a court to redact portions of a person's social security number, taxpayer identification number, birth date, or financial account number or the name of a minor when included in the filing, unless such information is otherwise required by statute, rule, or order. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504; Title 19; Title 20; Title 21; Title 24; Title 27 and Title 28.
Title
As enacted, allows a party or non-party making certain filings with a court to redact portions of a person's social security number, taxpayer identification number, birth date, or financial account number or the name of a minor when included in the filing, unless such information is otherwise required by statute, rule, or order. - Amends TCA Section 10-7-504; Title 19; Title 20; Title 21; Title 24; Title 27 and Title 28.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 151 | |
2019-04-01 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action def. in Judiciary to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Meeting Adjourned |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0955 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 151