TN HB0994 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 34-3)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that a threat to use deadly force by a private citizen making an arrest is not in itself considered a use of deadly force; prohibits a private citizen from threatening to use deadly force during the course of a citizen's arrest unless the arrest is for a crime committed or threatened against the citizen making the arrest or for a violent crime committed or threatened in the presence of the citizen making the arrest. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 11, Part 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 11, Part 6, relative to criminal liability.
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] | Rep. Kip Capley [R] | Rep. Monty Fritts [R] |
Rep. Bryan Richey [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Jody Barrett [R] |
Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] |
Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Elaine Davis [R] |
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Jesse Chism [D] | Rep. Michele Carringer [R] |
Rep. Ed Butler [R] | Rep. Michael Hale [R] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Kevin Raper [R] |
Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] |
Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. Brock Martin [R] | Rep. William Slater [R] | Rep. Gino Bulso [R] |
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-04-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-30 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/30/2024 |
2024-01-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 1/30/2024 |
2024-01-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/23/2024 |
2024-01-16 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2024-01-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/16/2024 |
2023-04-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2024 |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0908 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-04 - Withdrawn.