TN HB0961 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the issuance of a security temporary order of protection that a law enforcement officer may seek to prevent a restrained person from being able to lawfully possess a firearm when the officer believes that the person is a danger to the person or another. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes the issuance of a security temporary order of protection that a law enforcement officer may seek to prevent a restrained person from being able to lawfully possess a firearm when the officer believes that the person is a danger to the person or another. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
2018-03-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2018
2017-03-29HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-02-15HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-15HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2017-02-13HouseP1C.
2017-02-09HouseIntro.
2017-02-09HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0670 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback