TN HB0940 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 90 to 60 days the period, after the end of the fiscal year in which savings are realized, that a cash award must be paid to a state employee under the employee suggestion award plan for an adopted suggestion that results in substantial savings to this state. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12 and Title 58.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 12 and Title 58, relative to state government.
Sponsors
Rep. John Windle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0961 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Committee