TN HB0928 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/21
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Second Amendment Sanctuary Act," which declares a treaty, executive order, rule, or regulation of the U.S. government that violates the federal second amendment as null, void, and unenforceable in this state and prohibits the state and political subdivisions from using public resources to enforce, administer, or cooperate with the enforcement or administration of any such treaty, executive order, rule, or regulation. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38 and Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 38 and Title 39, relative to the Tennessee Second Amendment Sanctuary Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/21
2021-04-12HouseReset on cal. for 4/19/2021
2021-04-08HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021
2021-04-07HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021
2021-03-31HouseRec. for pass if am.; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/31/2021
2021-03-23HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
2021-03-16HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/23/2021
2021-03-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2021
2021-03-09HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/16/2021
2021-03-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-02-11HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-10HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1335 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback